TX HB4311 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Vetoed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the temporary board of and financing of certain facilities and improvements by the LaSalle Municipal Utility District No. 2; providing authority to impose an assessment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the temporary board of and financing of certain facilities and improvements by the LaSalle Municipal Utility District No. 2; providing authority to impose an assessment.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-24 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-19 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1358 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-15 Vetoed by the Governor
2017-05-30 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-30SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-29HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-27HouseReported enrolled
2017-05-25HouseSenate passage reported
2017-05-24SenateRecord vote
2017-05-24SenatePassed
2017-05-24SenateRead 3rd time
2017-05-24SenateRecord vote
2017-05-24SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-05-24SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-24SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2017-05-24SenateLaid before the Senate
2017-05-24SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2017-05-23SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-05-23SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2017-05-23SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2017-05-23SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-22SenateLeft pending in committee
2017-05-22SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-22SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-05-22SenatePosting rule suspended
2017-05-19SenateReferred to Administration
2017-05-19SenateRead first time
2017-05-19SenateReceived from the House
2017-05-19HouseReported engrossed
2017-05-19HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-19HouseRecord vote
2017-05-19HousePassed
2017-05-19HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-19HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-19HousePassed to engrossment
2017-05-19HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-19HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2017-05-16HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2017-05-05HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2017-05-05HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-05HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-05-05HouseRecommendations filed with the Speaker
2017-05-04HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-05-04HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2017-05-04HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-04-27HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-04-27HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-04-27HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-27HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-04-10HouseReferred to Special Purpose Districts
2017-04-10HouseRead first time
2017-04-07HouseTransmitted to the Governor
2017-04-04HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback