TX HB4303 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 28 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-15 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on May 28 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-15 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the creation of the Prairie Ridge Municipal Management District No. 1 and to the correction of defined terms in the law governing the Joshua Farms Municipal Management District No. 1 and the law governing the Joshua Farms Municipal Management District No. 2; providing authority to issue bonds; providing authority to impose assessments, fees, or taxes; granting a limited power of eminent domain.
Title
Relating to the creation of the Prairie Ridge Municipal Management District No. 1 and to the correction of defined terms in the law governing the Joshua Farms Municipal Management District No. 1 and the law governing the Joshua Farms Municipal Management District No. 2; providing authority to issue bonds; providing authority to impose assessments, fees, or taxes; granting a limited power of eminent domain.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-26 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1859 (Y: 129 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-19 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1358 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-19 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1358 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-15 | Effective on 9/1/17 | |
2017-06-15 | Filed without the Governor's signature | |
2017-05-30 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2017-05-29 | House | Signed in the House |
2017-05-28 | House | Reported enrolled |
2017-05-26 | Senate | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported |
2017-05-26 | House | Text of Senate Amendment(s) |
2017-05-26 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-26 | House | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) |
2017-05-25 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2017-05-25 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2017-05-24 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Passed |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Amended |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Laid out as postponed business |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Postponed |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-05-21 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-05-21 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-21 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Received from the House |
2017-05-19 | House | Reported engrossed |
2017-05-19 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-19 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-19 | House | Passed |
2017-05-19 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-19 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-19 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2017-05-19 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-19 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2017-05-16 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2017-05-05 | House | Recommendations filed with the Speaker |
2017-05-04 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2017-05-04 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-04 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-05-01 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-05-01 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2017-05-01 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-05-01 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-04-27 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-27 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-04-27 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-27 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-27 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-04-04 | House | Transmitted to the Governor |
2017-04-03 | House | Referred to Special Purpose Districts |
2017-04-03 | House | Read first time |
2017-03-30 | House | Filed |
Subjects
JOSHUA FARMS MUNICIPAL MANAGEMENT DISTRICT NO. 1
JOSHUA FARMS MUNICIPAL MANAGEMENT DISTRICT NO. 2
MUNICIPAL MANAGEMENT DISTRICTS
PRAIRIE RIDGE MUNICIPAL MANAGEMENT DISTRICT NO. 1
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Miscellaneous
JOSHUA FARMS MUNICIPAL MANAGEMENT DISTRICT NO. 2
MUNICIPAL MANAGEMENT DISTRICTS
PRAIRIE RIDGE MUNICIPAL MANAGEMENT DISTRICT NO. 1
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Miscellaneous