TX HB4289 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-17 - Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the authority of certain local governments to create and operate health care provider participation programs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the authority of certain local governments to create and operate health care provider participation programs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-08 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1132 (Y: 101 N: 40 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-17SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-05-17SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2019-05-17SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-15SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-05-15SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-05-15SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-15SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-05-10SenateReferred to Health & Human Services
2019-05-10SenateRead first time
2019-05-08SenateReceived from the House
2019-05-08HouseReported engrossed
2019-05-08HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-08HouseRecord vote RV#1132
2019-05-08HousePassed
2019-05-08HouseRead 3rd time
2019-05-07HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-07HousePassed to engrossment
2019-05-07HousePoint of order withdrawn Rule 8, Section 1(b)
2019-05-07HouseRead 2nd time
2019-05-06HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-05-03HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-23HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-22HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-22HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-16HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-16HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-04-16HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-04-04HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-04-04HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-04-04HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-04-04HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-04HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-25HouseReferred to County Affairs
2019-03-25HouseRead first time
2019-03-08HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB2256 (Same As) 2019-03-21 - Referred to Health & Human Services

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback