TX HB4279 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the eligibility of the Windham School District to participate in the Jobs and Education for Texans (JET) Grant Program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the eligibility of the Windham School District to participate in the Jobs and Education for Texans (JET) Grant Program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-22 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-22 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - House - Read 3rd time RV#951 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-14 Effective on 9/1/21
2021-06-14 Signed by the Governor
2021-05-25 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-25SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-24HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-23HouseReported enrolled
2021-05-23HouseSenate passage reported
2021-05-22SenateRecord vote
2021-05-22SenatePassed
2021-05-22SenateRead 3rd time
2021-05-22SenateRecord vote
2021-05-22SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-05-22SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-05-22SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2021-05-22SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-05-22SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-05-21SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-05-21SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2021-05-21SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2021-05-21SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-20SenateLeft pending in committee
2021-05-20SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-20SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-05-14SenateReferred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
2021-05-14SenateRead first time
2021-05-12SenateReceived from the House
2021-05-11HouseReported engrossed
2021-05-11HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-11HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-11HouseRecord vote RV#951
2021-05-11HousePassed
2021-05-11HouseRead 3rd time
2021-05-11HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-11HousePassed to engrossment
2021-05-11HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-11HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2021-05-07HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2021-05-05HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2021-05-04HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-05-04HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-30HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-04-30HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2021-04-30HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-04-14HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-04-14HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-04-14HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-14HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-29HouseReferred to International Relations & Economic Development
2021-03-29HouseRead first time
2021-03-12HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB4279
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB04279I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB04279S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB04279F.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB04279I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB04279H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB04279E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB04279E.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB4279&RcdVtNo=951&Ch=H&Dt=05/11/2021
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-22-F.PDF#page=22

Bill Comments 750

feedback