TX HB4276 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-12 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-12 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the management of temporary tags that may be obtained by a motor vehicle dealer or converter.
Title
Relating to the management of temporary tags that may be obtained by a motor vehicle dealer or converter.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-12 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-05-10 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-04-20 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-04-19 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-19 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-08 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-04-08 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-04-08 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-04-06 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-06 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-06 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-04-06 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-06 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to Transportation |
2021-03-29 | House | Read first time |
2021-03-12 | House | Filed |
Subjects
MOTOR VEHICLE DEALERS
MOTOR VEHICLES, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Vehicle Registration
MOTOR VEHICLES, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Vehicle Registration