TX HB4269 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-12 - Referred to Local Government
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the procedure to be used by an appraisal review board to conduct a hearing on a protest.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the procedure to be used by an appraisal review board to conduct a hearing on a protest.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-11 - House - Read 3rd time RV#951 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-12SenateReferred to Local Government
2021-05-12SenateRead first time
2021-05-12SenateReceived from the House
2021-05-11HouseReported engrossed
2021-05-11HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-11HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-11HouseRecord vote RV#951
2021-05-11HousePassed
2021-05-11HouseRead 3rd time
2021-05-11HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-11HousePassed to engrossment
2021-05-11HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-11HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2021-05-07HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2021-05-03HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2021-05-01HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-30HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-21HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-04-21HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2021-04-21HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-04-12HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-04-12HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-04-12HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-12HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-29HouseReferred to Ways & Means
2021-03-29HouseRead first time
2021-03-12HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback