TX HB4261 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 35-6)
Status: Introduced on March 13 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-05 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Status: Introduced on March 13 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-05 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Summary
Relating to establishing a no-interest loan program to promote the use of energy efficiency measures and renewable energy technology in certain residential dwellings, commercial buildings, and places of worship.
Title
Relating to establishing a no-interest loan program to promote the use of energy efficiency measures and renewable energy technology in certain residential dwellings, commercial buildings, and places of worship.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-05 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-05-04 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-04 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-04-30 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-04-30 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-04-30 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2009-04-14 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-04-14 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-04-14 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-04-14 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-14 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-24 | Referred to State Affairs | |
2009-03-24 | Read first time | |
2009-03-13 | Filed |
Subjects
Business & Commerce
Business & Commerce--Small Business & Minority Business
Energy
Energy--Conservation
LOANS
RENEWABLE ENERGY
Business & Commerce--Small Business & Minority Business
Energy
Energy--Conservation
LOANS
RENEWABLE ENERGY