TX HB4242 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-22 - Placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-22 - Placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the extension of the expiration of certain parts of the Texas Economic Development Act.
Title
Relating to the extension of the expiration of certain parts of the Texas Economic Development Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-08 - House - Read 3rd time RV#904 (Y: 112 N: 29 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-22 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Posting rule suspended |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Received from the House |
2021-05-08 | House | Reported engrossed |
2021-05-08 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-08 | House | Record vote RV#904 |
2021-05-08 | House | Passed |
2021-05-08 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-07 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-07 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2021-05-07 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-05-07 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-05-05 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-05-03 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-05-03 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-05-03 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-28 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-04-28 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-04-28 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-04-26 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-26 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-26 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-04-26 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-26 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to Ways & Means |
2021-03-29 | House | Read first time |
2021-03-12 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Economic & Industrial Development
Economic & Industrial Development--General
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Finance
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
Taxation--Property-Exemptions
Taxation--School District
Economic & Industrial Development--General
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Finance
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
Taxation--Property-Exemptions
Taxation--School District