TX HB4237 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-05 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-05 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to mental health first aid training for university employees.
Title
Relating to mental health first aid training for university employees.
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph Moody [D] | Rep. Garnet Coleman [D] | Rep. Four Price [R] | Rep. J.M. Lozano [R] |
Rep. Chris Turner [D] | Rep. Robert Guerra [D] | Rep. Celia Israel [D] | Rep. Victoria Neave Criado [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-05 | House | Laid on the table subject to call |
2017-05-05 | House | Companion considered in lieu of |
2017-05-04 | House | Postponed |
2017-05-04 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2017-05-03 | House | Postponed |
2017-05-03 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-03 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-04-26 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-04-25 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-04-24 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-04-24 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-18 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-04-18 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-11 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-11 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-04-11 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-11 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-04-04 | House | Referred to Public Health |
2017-04-04 | House | Read first time |
2017-03-10 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Faculty
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Other School Personnel
Mental Health & Substance Abuse
STAFF DEVELOPMENT & TRAINING
STATE HEALTH SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Faculty
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Other School Personnel
Mental Health & Substance Abuse
STAFF DEVELOPMENT & TRAINING
STATE HEALTH SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF