TX HB4230 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-27 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-27 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the authority of the Texas Water Development Board to provide financial assistance to political subdivisions for flood control or mitigation projects.
Title
Relating to the authority of the Texas Water Development Board to provide financial assistance to political subdivisions for flood control or mitigation projects.
Sponsors
Rep. Eugene Wu [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-27 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-27 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-04-27 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-27 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-04-27 | House | Posting rule suspended |
2017-04-26 | House | Meeting cancelled |
2017-04-26 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-04-03 | House | Referred to Natural Resources |
2017-04-03 | House | Read first time |
2017-03-10 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB4230 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HB04230I.htm |