TX HB4219 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 18 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-18 - Vetoed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the maximum rate or amount of interest of certain consumer loans.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the maximum rate or amount of interest of certain consumer loans.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-05-22 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-22 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-09 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1347 (Y: 130 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-18 Vetoed by the Governor
2023-05-26 Sent to the Governor
2023-05-26SenateSigned in the Senate
2023-05-25HouseSigned in the House
2023-05-23HouseReported enrolled
2023-05-22HouseSenate passage reported
2023-05-22SenateRecord vote
2023-05-22SenatePassed
2023-05-22SenateRead 3rd time
2023-05-22SenateRecord vote
2023-05-22SenateThree day rule suspended
2023-05-22SenateVote recorded in Journal
2023-05-22SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2023-05-22SenateVote recorded in Journal
2023-05-22SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2023-05-22SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2023-05-19SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2023-05-19SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2023-05-19SenateVote taken in committee
2023-05-19SenateTestimony taken in committee
2023-05-19SenateConsidered in public hearing
2023-05-19SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2023-05-11SenateReferred to Business & Commerce
2023-05-11SenateRead first time
2023-05-10SenateReceived from the House
2023-05-09HouseReported engrossed
2023-05-09HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2023-05-09HouseRecord vote RV#1347
2023-05-09HousePassed
2023-05-09HouseRead 3rd time
2023-05-08HousePassed to engrossment
2023-05-08HouseRead 2nd time
2023-05-08HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2023-05-05HouseConsidered in Calendars
2023-04-26HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2023-04-25HouseCommittee report distributed
2023-04-25HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2023-04-20HouseReported favorably as substituted
2023-04-20HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2023-04-20HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2023-04-12HouseLeft pending in committee
2023-04-12HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2023-04-12HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2023-04-12HouseConsidered in public hearing
2023-04-12HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2023-03-21HouseReferred to Pensions, Investments & Financial Services
2023-03-21HouseRead first time
2023-03-08HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=88R&Bill=HB4219
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/88R/billtext/html/HB04219I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/88R/billtext/html/HB04219H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/88R/billtext/html/HB04219E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/88R/billtext/html/HB04219S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/88R/billtext/html/HB04219F.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/88R/fiscalnotes/html/HB04219I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/88R/fiscalnotes/html/HB04219H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/88R/analysis/html/HB04219H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/88R/fiscalnotes/html/HB04219E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/88R/analysis/html/HB04219E.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=88R&Bill=HB4219&RcdVtNo=1347&Ch=H&Dt=05/09/2023
Roll Callhttps://journals.senate.texas.gov/sjrnl/88r/pdf/88RSJ05-22-F.PDF#page=79
Roll Callhttps://journals.senate.texas.gov/sjrnl/88r/pdf/88RSJ05-22-F.PDF#page=80

Bill Comments

feedback