TX HB4218 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-18 - Vetoed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to a cause of action for the bad faith washout of an overriding royalty interest in an oil and gas lease.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to a cause of action for the bad faith washout of an overriding royalty interest in an oil and gas lease.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-27 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - Read 3rd time RV#361 (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-18 Vetoed by the Governor
2021-05-31 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-31SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-29HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-28HouseReported enrolled
2021-05-27HouseSenate passage reported
2021-05-27SenateRecord vote
2021-05-27SenatePassed
2021-05-27SenateRead 3rd time
2021-05-27SenateRecord vote
2021-05-27SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-05-27SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-05-27SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2021-05-27SenateLaid before the Senate
2021-05-26SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2021-05-19SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-05-19SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2021-05-19SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2021-05-18SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-13SenateLeft pending in committee
2021-05-13SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-13SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-05-04SenateReferred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
2021-05-04SenateRead first time
2021-04-21SenateReceived from the House
2021-04-21HouseReported engrossed
2021-04-21HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-04-21HouseRecord vote RV#361
2021-04-21HousePassed
2021-04-21HouseRead 3rd time
2021-04-20HousePassed to engrossment
2021-04-20HouseRead 2nd time
2021-04-20HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-04-15HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-04-14HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-04-13HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-13HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-08HouseReported favorably as substituted
2021-04-08HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-04-08HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-04-06HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-04-06HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-04-06HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-06HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-29HouseReferred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
2021-03-29HouseRead first time
2021-03-12HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB4218
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB04218I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB04218H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB04218E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB04218S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB04218F.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB04218I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB04218H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB04218H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB04218E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB04218E.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB4218&RcdVtNo=361&Ch=H&Dt=04/21/2021
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-26-F.PDF#page=239

Bill Comments 750

feedback