TX HB4212 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-10 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-10 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the renewal of the Texas Health Care Transformation and Quality Improvement Program waiver under Medicaid.
Title
Relating to the renewal of the Texas Health Care Transformation and Quality Improvement Program waiver under Medicaid.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-10 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-05-08 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-05-06 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-05-06 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-05 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-05-04 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-05-04 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-28 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-28 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-04-28 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-28 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-04-04 | House | Referred to Appropriations |
2017-04-04 | House | Read first time |
2017-03-10 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB4212 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HB04212I.htm |