TX HB4205 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to accountability intervention provisions applicable to school district campuses, including the conditions under which a closed campus may be repurposed to serve students at that campus location and the creation of accelerated campus excellence turnaround plans.
Title
Relating to accountability intervention provisions applicable to school district campuses, including the conditions under which a closed campus may be repurposed to serve students at that campus location and the creation of accelerated campus excellence turnaround plans.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-24 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1821 (Y: 117 N: 24 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - Read 3rd time RV#682 (Y: 120 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - Read 3rd time RV#682 (Y: 120 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 22) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-10 | Effective immediately | |
2019-06-10 | Signed by the Governor | |
2019-05-27 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-27 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-05-27 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-05-27 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-24 | Senate | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported |
2019-05-24 | House | Text of Senate Amendment(s) |
2019-05-24 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-24 | House | Record vote RV#1821 |
2019-05-24 | House | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) |
2019-05-22 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2019-05-22 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2019-05-22 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Passed |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Amended |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA2 Watson |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Amended |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA1 Perry |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Referred to Education |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-04-26 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-25 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-25 | House | Record vote RV#682 |
2019-04-25 | House | Passed |
2019-04-25 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-24 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2019-04-24 | House | Amended 2-Huberty, Burrows, and Frullo |
2019-04-24 | House | Amended 1-Bernal |
2019-04-24 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-24 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-04-18 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-17 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-16 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-16 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-11 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-11 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-11 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-04 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-04 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-04 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-04 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-25 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2019-03-25 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-08 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Charitable & Nonprofit Organizations
Education
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Accountability
Education--Primary & Secondary--Facilities
Education--Primary & Secondary--Testing
Education
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Accountability
Education--Primary & Secondary--Facilities
Education--Primary & Secondary--Testing