TX HB4204 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-19 - Committee report printed and distributed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-19 - Committee report printed and distributed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to a study and report on the water level of Falcon Lake in Zapata and Starr Counties.
Title
Relating to a study and report on the water level of Falcon Lake in Zapata and Starr Counties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-30 - House - Read 3rd time RV#582 (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-19 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Referred to Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Received from the House |
2021-04-30 | House | Reported engrossed |
2021-04-30 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2021-04-30 | House | Record vote RV#582 |
2021-04-30 | House | Passed |
2021-04-30 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-30 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2021-04-30 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2021-04-30 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-30 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2021-04-27 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2021-04-23 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2021-04-22 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-22 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-15 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-04-15 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2021-04-15 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-04-15 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-04-12 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-12 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-12 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism |
2021-03-29 | House | Read first time |
2021-03-12 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Environment
Environment--Water
ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
FALCON LAKE
Parks & Wildlife
PARKS & WILDLIFE DEPARTMENT
Parks & Wildlife--Hunting & Fishing
STARR COUNTY
WATER
Water--General
ZAPATA COUNTY
Environment--Water
ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
FALCON LAKE
Parks & Wildlife
PARKS & WILDLIFE DEPARTMENT
Parks & Wildlife--Hunting & Fishing
STARR COUNTY
WATER
Water--General
ZAPATA COUNTY