TX HB4202 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 13 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-28 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Status: Introduced on March 13 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-28 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Summary
Relating to creating an account to promote continuing education for certain child care providers.
Title
Relating to creating an account to promote continuing education for certain child care providers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-28 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-04-28 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-27 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-04-23 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2009-04-23 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-09 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-04-09 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-04-09 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-09 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-24 | Referred to Human Services | |
2009-03-24 | Read first time | |
2009-03-13 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1722 (Same As) 2009-05-25 - Not again placed on intent calendar