TX HB4201 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-12 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to a feasibility study on the colocation of federal and state motor vehicle inspection facilities at ports of entry.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to a feasibility study on the colocation of federal and state motor vehicle inspection facilities at ports of entry.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-12HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-05-10HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-05-08HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-05-08HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-05-07HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-05-04HouseReported favorably as substituted
2021-05-04HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-05-04HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-27HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-04-27HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-04-27HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-04-27HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-27HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-29HouseReferred to Transportation
2021-03-29HouseRead first time
2021-03-12HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB1907 (Same As) 2021-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/21
SB1907 (Same As) 2021-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/21

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback