TX HB4184 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-17 - Received from the House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-17 - Received from the House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the licensing and regulation of certain drug and alcohol related court-ordered educational programs; providing administrative penalties; requiring occupational licenses; authorizing fees; creating criminal offenses.
Title
Relating to the licensing and regulation of certain drug and alcohol related court-ordered educational programs; providing administrative penalties; requiring occupational licenses; authorizing fees; creating criminal offenses.
Sponsors
Rep. Ryan Guillen [R] | Rep. Sergio Munoz [D] | Rep. Ana-Maria Ramos [D] | Rep. Richard Raymond [D] |
Rep. Robert Guerra [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-14 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1090 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-17 | Senate | Received from the House |
2021-05-16 | House | Reported engrossed |
2021-05-14 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-14 | House | Record vote RV#1090 |
2021-05-14 | House | Passed |
2021-05-14 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-14 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-14 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2021-05-14 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-05-14 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2021-05-11 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2021-05-08 | House | Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm. |
2021-05-08 | House | Withdrawn from calendar (by author) |
2021-05-08 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2021-05-04 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2021-04-30 | House | Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm. |
2021-04-30 | House | Withdrawn from calendar (by author) |
2021-04-30 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2021-04-27 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2021-04-21 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2021-04-20 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-20 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-15 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-04-15 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2021-04-15 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-04-14 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-14 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-14 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-14 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures |
2021-03-29 | House | Read first time |
2021-03-12 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1480 (Same As) 2021-06-18 - Effective on 9/1/21
Subjects
Alcoholism & Drug Abuse
Courts
Courts--General
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
LICENSING & REGULATION, TEXAS COMMISSION OF
LICENSING & REGULATION, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
STATE HEALTH SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
Courts
Courts--General
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
LICENSING & REGULATION, TEXAS COMMISSION OF
LICENSING & REGULATION, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
STATE HEALTH SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF