TX HB4183 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-5)
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to addressing adverse childhood experiences and developing a strategic plan to address those experiences.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to addressing adverse childhood experiences and developing a strategic plan to address those experiences.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-08 - House - Amendment withdrawn RV#1110 (Y: 131 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-15SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-05-15SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-05-15SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-15SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-05-10SenateReferred to Health & Human Services
2019-05-10SenateRead first time
2019-05-08SenateReceived from the House
2019-05-08HouseReported engrossed
2019-05-08HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-08HouseRecord vote RV#1110
2019-05-08HousePassed as amended
2019-05-08HouseAmendment withdrawn 4-Ramos
2019-05-08HouseAmendment withdrawn 3-Ramos
2019-05-08HousePoint of order withdrawn (amendment) Rule 11, Section 2, and Rule 11, Section 3
2019-05-08HouseAmendment(s) offered 3-Ramos
2019-05-08HouseAmendment fails of adoption 2-Rosenthal
2019-05-08HouseAmended 1-Parker
2019-05-08HouseRead 3rd time
2019-05-07HousePassed to engrossment
2019-05-07HouseRead 2nd time
2019-05-06HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-05-03HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-18HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-17HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-17HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-15HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-04-15HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-04-03HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-04-03HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-04-03HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-03HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-25HouseReferred to Public Health
2019-03-25HouseRead first time
2019-03-08HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback