TX HB4181 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-01 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-01 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the electronic transmission of certain notice required for air quality permits.
Title
Relating to the electronic transmission of certain notice required for air quality permits.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-19 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-19 - Senate - Passed (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - House - Read 3rd time RV#322 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-05-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-19 - Senate - Passed (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - House - Read 3rd time RV#322 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-01 | Effective on 9/1/17 | |
2017-06-01 | Signed by the Governor | |
2017-05-25 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2017-05-24 | House | Signed in the House |
2017-05-23 | House | Reported enrolled |
2017-05-20 | House | Senate passage reported |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Passed |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Received from the House |
2017-04-20 | House | Reported engrossed |
2017-04-20 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-04-20 | House | Record vote |
2017-04-20 | House | Passed |
2017-04-20 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-20 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2017-04-20 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-04-20 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2017-04-19 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2017-04-17 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2017-04-13 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-04-13 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-12 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-04-12 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2017-04-12 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-04-11 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-11 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-04-11 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-11 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-31 | House | Referred to Environmental Regulation |
2017-03-31 | House | Read first time |
2017-03-10 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Electronic Information Systems
EMAIL & ELECTRONIC COMMUNICATIONS
Environment
Environment--Air
ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
PERMITS
EMAIL & ELECTRONIC COMMUNICATIONS
Environment
Environment--Air
ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
PERMITS