TX HB4176 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-17 - Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
Pending: Senate Natural Resources & Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-17 - Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
Pending: Senate Natural Resources & Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to performance criteria for the award of adult education and literacy funds.
Title
Relating to performance criteria for the award of adult education and literacy funds.
Sponsors
Rep. Ryan Guillen [R] | Rep. Sergio Munoz [D] | Rep. Ana-Maria Ramos [D] | Rep. Richard Raymond [D] |
Rep. Robert Guerra [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-14 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1090 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-17 | Senate | Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Received from the House |
2021-05-14 | House | Reported engrossed |
2021-05-14 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-14 | House | Record vote RV#1090 |
2021-05-14 | House | Passed |
2021-05-14 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-14 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-14 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2021-05-14 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-05-14 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2021-05-11 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2021-05-07 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2021-05-06 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-05-06 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-30 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-04-30 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2021-04-30 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-04-30 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-04-14 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-14 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-14 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-14 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to International Relations & Economic Development |
2021-03-29 | House | Read first time |
2021-03-12 | House | Filed |
Subjects
ADULT EDUCATION
Education
Education--General
Labor
Labor--Workforce Development
WORKFORCE COMMISSION, TEXAS
Education
Education--General
Labor
Labor--Workforce Development
WORKFORCE COMMISSION, TEXAS