TX HB4171 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-27 - Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-27 - Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the state designation of employee owned corporations.
Title
Relating to the state designation of employee owned corporations.
Sponsors
Rep. Ryan Guillen [R] | Rep. Hugh Shine [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-27 | House | Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm. |
2017-04-27 | House | Vote reconsidered in committee |
2017-04-27 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-04-27 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-04-17 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-17 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-04-17 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-17 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-31 | House | Referred to Business & Industry |
2017-03-31 | House | Read first time |
2017-03-10 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB4171 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HB04171I.htm |