TX HB4168 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-11 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-11 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to requirements for the court in permanency hearings for children in the conservatorship of the Department of Family and Protective Services who are receiving transitional living services.
Title
Relating to requirements for the court in permanency hearings for children in the conservatorship of the Department of Family and Protective Services who are receiving transitional living services.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-11 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-05-09 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-05-03 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-05-03 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-03 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-05-01 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-05-01 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-05-01 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-05-01 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-01 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-31 | House | Referred to Human Services |
2017-03-31 | House | Read first time |
2017-03-10 | House | Filed |
Subjects
CONSERVATORSHIP
Family
FAMILY & PROTECTIVE SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
Family--Child Protection
NATIVE AMERICANS
Family
FAMILY & PROTECTIVE SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
Family--Child Protection
NATIVE AMERICANS