TX HB4154 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-24 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-24 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the renewal of a plumber's apprentice certificate of registration.
Title
Relating to the renewal of a plumber's apprentice certificate of registration.
Sponsors
Rep. Dennis Paul [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-24 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-04-24 | House | Transferred to Calendars Committee |
2017-04-24 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2017-04-24 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2017-04-23 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-04-21 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-20 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-04-20 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2017-04-20 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-04-17 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-17 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-04-17 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-17 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-31 | House | Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures |
2017-03-31 | House | Read first time |
2017-03-10 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
PLUMBERS & PLUMBING
STAFF DEVELOPMENT & TRAINING
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
PLUMBERS & PLUMBING
STAFF DEVELOPMENT & TRAINING
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB4154 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HB04154I.htm |