TX HB415 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on November 21 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-10 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the prosecution of the offense of aggravated kidnapping.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the prosecution of the offense of aggravated kidnapping.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-10HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-05-08HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-05-05HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-05-05HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-05HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-05-02HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-05-02HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-05-01HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-05-01HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-05-01HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-01HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-05-01HousePosting rule suspended
2017-02-16HouseReferred to Criminal Jurisprudence
2017-02-16HouseRead first time
2016-11-21HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback