TX HB4132 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-14 - Referred to Business & Commerce
Pending: Senate Business & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-14 - Referred to Business & Commerce
Pending: Senate Business & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to maintenance and production of electronic public information under the public information law.
Title
Relating to maintenance and production of electronic public information under the public information law.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-08 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1147 (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-14 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-05-08 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-05-08 | House | Record vote RV#1147 |
2019-05-08 | House | Passed |
2019-05-08 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-07 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2019-05-07 | House | Amended 1-Rodriguez |
2019-05-07 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-06 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-05-03 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-30 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-30 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-30 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-25 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-25 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-25 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-08 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-08 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-08 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-08 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-25 | House | Referred to State Affairs |
2019-03-25 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-07 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1317 (Same As) 2019-03-07 - Referred to Business & Commerce