TX HB4115 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-27 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-27 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to consumer protections against certain medical and health care billing by out-of-network ground ambulance service providers.
Title
Relating to consumer protections against certain medical and health care billing by out-of-network ground ambulance service providers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-27 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-27 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-27 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-04-27 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-27 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to Insurance |
2021-03-29 | House | Read first time |
2021-03-12 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB999 (Same As) 2021-05-14 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Subjects
AMBULANCES
Consumer Protection
HEALTH MAINTENANCE ORGANIZATIONS
Insurance
INSURANCE, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Insurance--Health & Accident
Consumer Protection
HEALTH MAINTENANCE ORGANIZATIONS
Insurance
INSURANCE, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Insurance--Health & Accident