TX HB4101 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 13 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-01 - No action taken in committee
Status: Introduced on March 13 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-01 - No action taken in committee
Summary
Relating to punishment for the offense of theft committed in certain evacuated or disaster areas.
Title
Relating to punishment for the offense of theft committed in certain evacuated or disaster areas.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-01 | No action taken in committee | |
2009-04-01 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-23 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | |
2009-03-23 | Read first time | |
2009-03-13 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB359 (Same As) 2009-06-19 - Effective on 9/1/09
Subjects
Crimes
Crimes--Against Property
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--Sentencing & Punishment
Disaster Preparedness & Relief
Crimes--Against Property
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--Sentencing & Punishment
Disaster Preparedness & Relief