TX HB41 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-17 - Received from the House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-17 - Received from the House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to class size limits for prekindergarten classes provided by or on behalf of public schools.
Title
Relating to class size limits for prekindergarten classes provided by or on behalf of public schools.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-14 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1168 (Y: 77 N: 65 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-17 | Senate | Received from the House |
2021-05-14 | House | Reported engrossed |
2021-05-14 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-14 | House | Record vote RV#1168 |
2021-05-14 | House | Passed |
2021-05-14 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-13 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2021-05-13 | House | Amended 1-Talarico |
2021-05-13 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-05-12 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-05-10 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-05-07 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-05-06 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-05-06 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-23 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-04-23 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-04-23 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-04-06 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-06 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-06 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-04-06 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-06 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-02-25 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2021-02-25 | House | Read first time |
2020-11-09 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB2081 (Similar To) 2021-06-18 - Effective on 9/1/21
SB2081 (Similar To) 2021-06-18 - Effective on 9/1/21
SB2081 (Similar To) 2021-06-18 - Effective on 9/1/21
Subjects
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
EDUCATION--PRIMARY & SECONDARY--CLASS SIZE
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
PRESCHOOL & PREKINDERGARTEN
Education--Primary & Secondary
EDUCATION--PRIMARY & SECONDARY--CLASS SIZE
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
PRESCHOOL & PREKINDERGARTEN