TX HB4096 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-11 - Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-11 - Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the development of model data-sharing agreements for sharing certain student information between public schools, public and private institutions of higher education, and other entities.
Title
Relating to the development of model data-sharing agreements for sharing certain student information between public schools, public and private institutions of higher education, and other entities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-11 | House | Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm. |
2021-05-11 | House | Withdrawn from calendar (by author) |
2021-05-11 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2021-05-07 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2021-04-30 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2021-04-30 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-29 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-15 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-04-15 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2021-04-15 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-04-15 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-04-13 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-13 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-13 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-04-13 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-13 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2021-03-29 | House | Read first time |
2021-03-12 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB788 (Similar To) 2021-05-24 - Effective on 9/1/21
SB788 (Similar To) 2021-05-24 - Effective on 9/1/21
SB788 (Similar To) 2021-05-24 - Effective on 9/1/21
Subjects
Education
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--General
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS
Protection of Personal Information
WORKFORCE COMMISSION, TEXAS
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--General
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS
Protection of Personal Information
WORKFORCE COMMISSION, TEXAS