TX HB4086 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-14 - Referred to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-14 - Referred to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the definition of "closing" for purposes of certain private activity bonds.
Title
Relating to the definition of "closing" for purposes of certain private activity bonds.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-10 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1258 (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-14 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-05-10 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-05-10 | House | Record vote RV#1258 |
2019-05-10 | House | Passed |
2019-05-10 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-10 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2019-05-10 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-10 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2019-05-07 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2019-05-05 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2019-05-04 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-05-03 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-05-02 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-05-02 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2019-05-02 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-05-02 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-25 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-25 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-25 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-25 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-25 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-21 | House | Referred to Pensions, Investments & Financial Services |
2019-03-21 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-07 | House | Filed |