TX HB4071 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to directing payment, after approval, of certain miscellaneous claims and judgments against the state out of funds designated by this Act; making appropriations.
Title
Relating to directing payment, after approval, of certain miscellaneous claims and judgments against the state out of funds designated by this Act; making appropriations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-15 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1411 (Y: 144 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - House - Read 3rd time RV#524 (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - House - Read 3rd time RV#524 (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-14 | Effective on 9/1/19 | |
2019-06-14 | Signed by the Governor | |
2019-05-22 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-18 | Sent to the Comptroller | |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Signed in Senate-Art III Sec 49a Tx. Const. |
2019-05-17 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-05-16 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-16 | Senate | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported |
2019-05-15 | House | Text of Senate Amendment(s) |
2019-05-15 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-15 | House | Subject to Art.III Sec.49a Tx. Constitution |
2019-05-15 | House | Record vote RV#1411 |
2019-05-15 | House | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) |
2019-05-13 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2019-05-13 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2019-05-13 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Passed |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-04-18 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-18 | House | Record vote RV#524 |
2019-04-18 | House | Passed |
2019-04-18 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-17 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2019-04-17 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-17 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-04-15 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-11 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-11 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-11 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-10 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-10 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-08 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-08 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-08 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-08 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-21 | House | Referred to Appropriations |
2019-03-21 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-07 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB2080 (Same As) 2019-04-24 - Left pending in committee