TX HB407 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - See remarks for effective date
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - See remarks for effective date
Summary
Relating to participation and credit in, contributions to, benefits from, and administration of the Texas County and District Retirement System.
Title
Relating to participation and credit in, contributions to, benefits from, and administration of the Texas County and District Retirement System.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-19 | See remarks for effective date | |
2009-06-19 | Signed by the Governor | |
2009-05-26 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-05-25 | Signed in the Senate | |
2009-05-25 | Signed in the House | |
2009-05-25 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-05-23 | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported | |
2009-05-23 | Text of Senate Amendment(s) | |
2009-05-23 | Record vote | |
2009-05-23 | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) | |
2009-05-20 | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed | |
2009-05-20 | Senate Amendments printed and distributed | |
2009-05-19 | Senate passage as amended reported | |
2009-05-19 | Record vote | |
2009-05-19 | Passed | |
2009-05-19 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-19 | Record vote | |
2009-05-19 | Three day rule suspended | |
2009-05-19 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-19 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | |
2009-05-19 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2009-05-21 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-05-18 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2009-05-14 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-14 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-05-14 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-05-11 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-05-07 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-05-07 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-05-07 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-05-04 | No action taken in committee | |
2009-05-04 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-04-16 | Referred to State Affairs | |
2009-04-16 | Read first time | |
2009-04-16 | Received from the House | |
2009-04-16 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-04-15 | Record vote | |
2009-04-15 | Passed | |
2009-04-15 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-04-15 | Passed to engrossment | |
2009-04-15 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-04-15 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2009-04-09 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2009-04-07 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2009-04-06 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-06 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-03-25 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-03-25 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2009-03-25 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-03-25 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-03-25 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-25 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-02-18 | Referred to Pensions, Investments & Financial Services | |
2009-02-18 | Read first time | |
2008-12-15 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB2263 (Similar To) 2009-03-31 - Referred to State Affairs