TX HB4069 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-07 - Referred directly to subcommittee by chair
Pending: House Licensing & Administrative Procedures Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-07 - Referred directly to subcommittee by chair
Pending: House Licensing & Administrative Procedures Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to abolition of the Texas Alcoholic Beverage Commission and the transfer of the regulation of alcoholic beverages to the Texas Department of Licensing and Regulation.
Title
Relating to abolition of the Texas Alcoholic Beverage Commission and the transfer of the regulation of alcoholic beverages to the Texas Department of Licensing and Regulation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-07 | House | Referred directly to subcommittee by chair |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures |
2021-03-29 | House | Read first time |
2021-03-12 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1975 (Same As) 2021-04-01 - Referred to Business & Commerce
Subjects
ALCOHOLIC BEVERAGE COMMISSION, TEXAS
Alcoholic Beverage Regulation
LICENSING & REGULATION, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Alcoholic Beverage Regulation
LICENSING & REGULATION, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB4069 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB04069I.htm |