TX HB4067 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-28 - Returned from the House for further action
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-28 - Returned from the House for further action
Summary
Relating to the creation of the Bureau for Economic Development of the Border Region.
Title
Relating to the creation of the Bureau for Economic Development of the Border Region.
Sponsors
Rep. Norma Chavez [D] | Rep. Veronica Gonzales [D] | Rep. David Leibowitz [D] | Sen. Eddie Lucio [D] |
Rep. Armando Martinez [D] | Rep. Rene Oliveira [D] | Sen. Carlos Uresti [D] | Sen. Leticia Van De Putte [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-28 | Returned from the House for further action | |
2009-05-28 | Returned to the Senate for further action | |
2009-05-28 | Senate passage as amended reported | |
2009-05-25 | Record vote | |
2009-05-25 | Passed | |
2009-05-25 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-25 | Record vote | |
2009-05-25 | Three day rule suspended | |
2009-05-25 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-25 | Passed to 3rd reading as amended | |
2009-05-25 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-25 | Amended | |
2009-05-25 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2009-05-25 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-05-25 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2009-05-26 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-05-23 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2009-05-22 | Co-sponsor authorized | |
2009-05-20 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-20 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-05-20 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2009-05-20 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2009-05-20 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-05-20 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-05-19 | Co-sponsor authorized | |
2009-05-14 | Referred to International Relations and Trade | |
2009-05-14 | Read first time | |
2009-05-13 | Received from the House | |
2009-05-12 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-05-12 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-12 | Record vote | |
2009-05-12 | Passed | |
2009-05-12 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-12 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-12 | Passed to engrossment | |
2009-05-12 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-05-12 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2009-05-08 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2009-05-07 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2009-05-06 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-06 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-05-04 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-05-04 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2009-05-04 | Amendment(s) considered in committee | |
2009-05-04 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-05-04 | Vote reconsidered in committee | |
2009-05-04 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-27 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-04-27 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2009-04-27 | Vote reconsidered in committee | |
2009-04-27 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-04-27 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2009-04-27 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-04-27 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-15 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-04-15 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-04-15 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-04-15 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-15 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-30 | No action taken in committee | |
2009-03-30 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-23 | Referred to Border & Intergovernmental Affairs | |
2009-03-23 | Read first time | |
2009-03-12 | Filed |
Subjects
BORDER
Economic & Industrial Development
Economic & Industrial Development--General
ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT OF THE BORDER REGION, BUREAU FOR
GIFTS & DONATIONS
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions--Newly Proposed
Economic & Industrial Development
Economic & Industrial Development--General
ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT OF THE BORDER REGION, BUREAU FOR
GIFTS & DONATIONS
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions--Newly Proposed