TX HB4064 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-26 - Returned from the House for further action
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-26 - Returned from the House for further action
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to staff development and continuing education requirements for public school educators regarding digital education methods.
Title
Relating to staff development and continuing education requirements for public school educators regarding digital education methods.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-22 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Record vote (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - FA5 Campbell (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - FA3 Hughes (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1049 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Record vote (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - FA5 Campbell (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - FA3 Hughes (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1049 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-26 | Senate | Returned from the House for further action |
2017-05-25 | House | Returned to the Senate for further action |
2017-05-24 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2017-05-24 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2017-05-23 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Passed |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Amended |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Amended |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Amended |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Amended |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Amended |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Referred to Education |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Received from the House |
2017-05-09 | House | Reported engrossed |
2017-05-09 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-09 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-09 | House | Passed |
2017-05-09 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-09 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-09 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2017-05-09 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-09 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2017-05-08 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2017-05-03 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2017-05-02 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-02 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-25 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-04-25 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2017-04-25 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-25 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-18 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-18 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-04-18 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-18 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-18 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-04-03 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2017-04-03 | House | Read first time |
2017-03-10 | House | Filed |
Subjects
CONTINUING EDUCATION
Education
EDUCATION, STATE BOARD OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Curriculum
Education--Primary & Secondary--Teachers
Science & Technology
STAFF DEVELOPMENT & TRAINING
Education
EDUCATION, STATE BOARD OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Curriculum
Education--Primary & Secondary--Teachers
Science & Technology
STAFF DEVELOPMENT & TRAINING