TX HB4054 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-01 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the application of sales and use taxes to certain food items.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the application of sales and use taxes to certain food items.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-21 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1520 (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-05-19 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - House - Read 3rd time RV#662 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-01 Effective on 9/1/17
2017-06-01 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-25 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-24SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-23HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-22HouseReported enrolled
2017-05-21SenateHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
2017-05-21HouseText of Senate Amendment(s)
2017-05-21HouseRecord vote
2017-05-21HouseHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)
2017-05-20HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2017-05-20HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2017-05-20HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2017-05-19SenateRecord vote
2017-05-19SenatePassed
2017-05-19SenateRead 3rd time
2017-05-19SenateRecord vote
2017-05-19SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-05-19SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-19SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2017-05-19SenateLaid before the Senate
2017-05-19SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2017-05-12SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-05-12SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2017-05-12SenateReported favorably as substituted
2017-05-11SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-11SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-05-05SenateReferred to Finance
2017-05-05SenateRead first time
2017-05-03SenateReceived from the House
2017-05-03HouseReported engrossed
2017-05-03HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-03HouseRecord vote
2017-05-03HousePassed
2017-05-03HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-02HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2017-05-02HouseAmended
2017-05-02HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-02HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-04-27HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-04-26HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-04-25HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-04-25HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-04-19HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-04-19HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-12HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-04-12HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-04-12HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-12HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-04-03HouseReferred to Ways & Means
2017-04-03HouseRead first time
2017-03-10HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback