TX HB4047 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-13 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-13 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to allowing health care providers to enter certain claims and other information into the Medicaid electronic visit verification system.
Title
Relating to allowing health care providers to enter certain claims and other information into the Medicaid electronic visit verification system.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-13 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-05-11 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-05-10 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-05-10 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-05-10 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-05-07 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-05-07 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-05-07 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-04-27 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-27 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-27 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-27 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-04-26 | House | Posting rule suspended |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to Human Services |
2021-03-29 | House | Read first time |
2021-03-11 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Electronic Information Systems
Health Care Providers
Human Services
Human Services--Medical Assistance
MEDICAID
Health Care Providers
Human Services
Human Services--Medical Assistance
MEDICAID