TX HB4044 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to a registrar's failure to cancel voter registrations under applicable law.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to a registrar's failure to cancel voter registrations under applicable law.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-29HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-04-29HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-29HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-21HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-04-21HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-04-21HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-21HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-29HouseReferred to Elections
2021-03-29HouseRead first time
2021-03-11HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB1113 (Similar To) 2021-04-27 - Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
SB1113 (Similar To) 2021-04-27 - Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback