TX HB4031 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-07 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-07 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the eligibility of certain municipalities to establish homestead preservation districts and reinvestment zones.
Title
Relating to the eligibility of certain municipalities to establish homestead preservation districts and reinvestment zones.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-07 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-05-06 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-05-06 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-05-04 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-05-04 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-04-21 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-21 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-21 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-21 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to Urban Affairs |
2021-03-29 | House | Read first time |
2021-03-11 | House | Filed |
Subjects
City Government
City Government--Land Use & Zoning
Property Interests
Property Interests--Homestead
REINVESTMENT ZONES
City Government--Land Use & Zoning
Property Interests
Property Interests--Homestead
REINVESTMENT ZONES