TX HB4029 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-08 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-08 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the division of the Montgomery County Municipal Utility District No. 152.
Title
Relating to the division of the Montgomery County Municipal Utility District No. 152.
Sponsors
Rep. Steve Toth [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-08 | House | Laid on the table subject to call |
2021-05-08 | House | Companion considered in lieu of SB 2174 |
2021-05-08 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2021-05-04 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2021-04-26 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2021-04-23 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-23 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-16 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-04-16 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2021-04-16 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-04-13 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-13 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-13 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-13 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-04-08 | House | Recommendations filed with the Speaker |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to Land & Resource Management |
2021-03-29 | House | Read first time |
2021-03-12 | House | Transmitted to the Governor |
2021-03-11 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB2174 (Same As) 2021-05-24 - Effective immediately
SB2174 (Same As) 2021-05-24 - Effective immediately
SB2174 (Same As) 2021-05-24 - Effective immediately
Subjects
MONTGOMERY COUNTY MUNICIPAL UTILITY DISTRICT NO. 152
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Municipal Utility Districts
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Municipal Utility Districts
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility