TX HB4026 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-13 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the disposition of surplus traffic and roadwork safety equipment by the Department of Public Safety and Texas Department of Transportation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the disposition of surplus traffic and roadwork safety equipment by the Department of Public Safety and Texas Department of Transportation.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-13HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-05-11HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-04-23HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-04-23HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-22HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-13HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-04-13HouseVote reconsidered in committee
2021-04-13HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-08HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-04-08HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2021-04-08HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-04-06HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-04-06HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-04-06HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-06HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-29HouseReferred to Transportation
2021-03-29HouseRead first time
2021-03-11HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback