TX HB4025 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on June 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-20 - Vetoed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on June 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-20 - Vetoed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to funding to counties for transportation infrastructure projects located in areas of the state affected by increased oil and gas production, including money from county energy transportation reinvestment zones.
Title
Relating to funding to counties for transportation infrastructure projects located in areas of the state affected by increased oil and gas production, including money from county energy transportation reinvestment zones.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-28 - House - HB 4025Third Reading House (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-04-30 - House - HB 4025Third Reading House (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-04-30 - House - HB 4025Third Reading House (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-20 | Vetoed by the Governor | |
2015-05-30 | Sent to the Governor | |
2015-05-30 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2015-05-30 | House | Signed in the House |
2015-05-29 | Senate | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported |
2015-05-29 | House | Reported enrolled |
2015-05-28 | House | Text of Senate Amendment(s) |
2015-05-28 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-28 | House | Record vote |
2015-05-28 | House | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) |
2015-05-27 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2015-05-27 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2015-05-27 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Passed |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Amended |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2015-05-25 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Referred to Transportation |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Received from the House |
2015-04-30 | House | Reported engrossed |
2015-04-30 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2015-04-30 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2015-04-30 | House | Record vote |
2015-04-30 | House | Passed |
2015-04-30 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-04-30 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2015-04-30 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2015-04-30 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-04-30 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2015-04-27 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2015-04-20 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2015-04-20 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-04-17 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-04-13 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2015-04-13 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2015-04-13 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2015-04-09 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-04-09 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-04-09 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-09 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-23 | House | Referred to Transportation |
2015-03-23 | House | Read first time |
2015-03-13 | House | Filed |
Subjects
County Government
County Government--Finance
County Government--Roads
Highways
Oil & Gas
REINVESTMENT ZONES
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Assessment & Collection
Transportation
TRANSPORTATION, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Transportation--Miscellaneous
County Government--Finance
County Government--Roads
Highways
Oil & Gas
REINVESTMENT ZONES
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Assessment & Collection
Transportation
TRANSPORTATION, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Transportation--Miscellaneous