TX HB4016 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-26 - Removed from local & uncontested calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to operating agreements between holders of a distiller's and rectifier's permit and certain alcoholic beverage permit holders.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to operating agreements between holders of a distiller's and rectifier's permit and certain alcoholic beverage permit holders.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-30 - House - Read 3rd time RV#582 (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-26SenateRemoved from local & uncontested calendar
2021-05-26SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2021-05-20SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-05-20SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2021-05-20SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2021-05-20SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-18SenateLeft pending in committee
2021-05-18SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-18SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-05-12SenateReferred to Business & Commerce
2021-05-12SenateRead first time
2021-05-03SenateReceived from the House
2021-05-03HouseReported engrossed
2021-04-30HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2021-04-30HouseRecord vote RV#582
2021-04-30HousePassed
2021-04-30HouseRead 3rd time
2021-04-30HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2021-04-30HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2021-04-30HouseAmended 1-Kuempel
2021-04-30HouseRead 2nd time
2021-04-30HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2021-04-27HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2021-04-20HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2021-04-20HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-19HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-15HouseReported favorably as substituted
2021-04-15HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2021-04-15HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-04-15HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-04-14HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-04-14HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-04-14HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-04-14HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-14HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-29HouseReferred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
2021-03-29HouseRead first time
2021-03-11HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB4016
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB04016I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB04016H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB04016E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB04016S.htm
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB04016H21.HTM
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB04016I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB04016H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB04016H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB04016E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB04016E.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB4016&RcdVtNo=582&Ch=H&Dt=04/30/2021

Bill Comments 750

feedback