TX HB4014 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on March 12 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Placed on General State Calendar

Summary

Relating to prohibiting school districts from requiring or coercing school district employees to make charitable contributions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to prohibiting school districts from requiring or coercing school district employees to make charitable contributions.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2009-05-11 Placed on General State Calendar
2009-05-08 Considered in Calendars
2009-04-20 Committee report sent to Calendars
2009-04-18 Committee report printed and distributed
2009-04-17 Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2009-04-09 Reported favorably as substituted
2009-04-09 Committee substitute considered in committee
2009-04-09 Considered in formal meeting
2009-04-07 Left pending in committee
2009-04-07 Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2009-04-07 Considered in public hearing
2009-04-07 Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
2009-03-23 Referred to Public Education
2009-03-23 Read first time
2009-03-12 Filed

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback