TX HB4013 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - Returned to committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to sales and use taxes on e-cigarettes and vapor products; imposing taxes; providing an administrative penalty; authorizing the imposition of a fee.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to sales and use taxes on e-cigarettes and vapor products; imposing taxes; providing an administrative penalty; authorizing the imposition of a fee.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-09HouseReturned to committee
2019-05-09HousePoint of order sustained Rule 4, Section 18(a)(4)
2019-05-09HouseRead 2nd time
2019-05-08HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-05-06HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-24HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-23HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-23HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-17HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-17HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-04-17HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-09HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-04-09HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-04-09HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-04-09HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-09HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-21HouseReferred to Ways & Means
2019-03-21HouseRead first time
2019-03-07HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB1332 (Same As) 2019-03-19 - Co-author authorized

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback