TX HB4012 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-13 - Referred to Business & Commerce
Pending: Senate Business & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-13 - Referred to Business & Commerce
Pending: Senate Business & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to an explanation of benefits provided by certain health benefit plans to enrollees regarding certain preauthorized medical care and health care services.
Title
Relating to an explanation of benefits provided by certain health benefit plans to enrollees regarding certain preauthorized medical care and health care services.
Sponsors
Rep. Greg Bonnen [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-11 - House - Read 3rd time RV#962 (Y: 128 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-13 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Received from the House |
2021-05-11 | House | Reported engrossed |
2021-05-11 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-11 | House | Record vote RV#962 |
2021-05-11 | House | Passed |
2021-05-11 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-10 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-10 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2021-05-10 | House | Amended 1-Bonnen |
2021-05-10 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-05-07 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-05-05 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-05-04 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-05-03 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-05-03 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-27 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-04-27 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-04-27 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-13 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-13 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-13 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-13 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to Insurance |
2021-03-29 | House | Read first time |
2021-03-11 | House | Filed |