TX HB4007 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-14 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to procedures applicable to a person released on parole or to mandatory supervision and charged with certain new offenses or an administrative violation of a condition of release.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to procedures applicable to a person released on parole or to mandatory supervision and charged with certain new offenses or an administrative violation of a condition of release.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-14HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2015-05-12HouseConsidered in Calendars
2015-04-28HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2015-04-28HouseCommittee report distributed
2015-04-28HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2015-04-22HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2015-04-22HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2015-04-15HouseLeft pending in committee
2015-04-15HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2015-04-15HouseConsidered in public hearing
2015-04-15HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2015-03-23HouseReferred to Criminal Jurisprudence
2015-03-23HouseRead first time
2015-03-13HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback