TX HB4 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-15 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the provision and delivery of certain health care services in this state, including services under Medicaid and other public benefits programs, using telecommunications or information technology and to reimbursement for some of those services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the provision and delivery of certain health care services in this state, including services under Medicaid and other public benefits programs, using telecommunications or information technology and to reimbursement for some of those services.

Sponsors

Rep. Four Price [R]Rep. Tom Oliverson [R]Rep. Garnet Coleman [D]Rep. Trent Ashby [R]
Rep. Ryan Guillen [D]Rep. Alma Allen [D]Rep. Stephen Allison [R]Rep. Charles Anderson [R]
Rep. Michelle Beckley [D]Rep. Keith Bell [R]Rep. Kyle Biedermann [R]Rep. Greg Bonnen [R]
Rep. Dewayne Burns [R]Rep. Dustin Burrows [R]Rep. Angie Button [R]Rep. Briscoe Cain [R]
Rep. Elizabeth Campos [D]Rep. Terry Canales [D]Rep. Giovanni Capriglione [R]Rep. Travis Clardy [R]
Rep. Sheryl Cole [D]Rep. Nicole Collier [D]Rep. David Cook [R]Rep. Philip Cortez [D]
Rep. John Cyrier [R]Rep. Drew Darby [R]Rep. Jay Dean [R]Rep. Jake Ellzey [R]
Rep. Art Fierro [D]Rep. James Frank [R]Rep. John Frullo [R]Rep. Charlie Geren [R]
Rep. Mary Gonzalez [D]Rep. Robert Guerra [D]Rep. Cole Hefner [R]Rep. Abel Herrero [D]
Rep. Donna Howard [D]Rep. Lacey Hull [R]Rep. Jacey Jetton [R]Rep. Julie Johnson [D]
Rep. Kyle Kacal [R]Rep. Ken King [R]Rep. Phil King [R]Rep. Stan Lambert [R]
Rep. Brooks Landgraf [R]Rep. Jeff Leach [R]Rep. Ben Leman [R]Rep. Ray Lopez [D]
Rep. Armando Martinez [D]Rep. Terry Meza [D]Rep. Mayes Middleton [R]Rep. Ina Minjarez [D]
Rep. Penny Morales Shaw [D]Rep. Christina Morales [D]Rep. Eddie Morales [D]Rep. Andrew Murr [R]
Rep. Victoria Neave [D]Rep. Claudia Ordaz Perez [D]Rep. Lina Ortega [D]Rep. Leo Pacheco [D]
Rep. Tan Parker [R]Rep. Dennis Paul [R]Rep. Ana-Maria Ramos [D]Rep. John Raney [R]
Rep. Richard Raymond [D]Rep. Eddie Rodriguez [D]Rep. Glenn Rogers [R]Rep. Ramon Romero [D]
Rep. Toni Rose [D]Rep. Matthew Shaheen [R]Rep. Hugh Shine [R]Rep. Bryan Slaton [R]
Rep. Reggie Smith [R]Rep. David Spiller [R]Rep. Ed Thompson [R]Rep. Tony Tinderholt [R]
Rep. Steve Toth [R]Rep. Chris Turner [D]Rep. John Turner [D]Rep. Gary Vandeaver [R]
Rep. Cody Vasut [R]Rep. James White [R]Rep. Terry Wilson [R]Rep. Eugene Wu [D]
Rep. Erin Zwiener [D]Sen. Dawn Buckingham [R]Sen. Cesar Blanco [D]Sen. Kelly Hancock [R]
Sen. Juan Hinojosa [D]

Roll Calls

2021-05-28 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1615 (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - House - Read 3rd time RV#227 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-15 Effective immediately
2021-06-15 Signed by the Governor
2021-05-31 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-31SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-29HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-29HouseReported enrolled
2021-05-28SenateHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
2021-05-28HouseText of Senate Amendment(s)
2021-05-28HouseRecord vote RV#1615
2021-05-28HouseHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)
2021-05-27HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2021-05-27HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2021-05-26HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2021-05-24SenateRecord vote
2021-05-24SenatePassed
2021-05-24SenateRead 3rd time
2021-05-24SenateRecord vote
2021-05-24SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-05-24SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-05-24SenatePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2021-05-24SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-05-24SenateAmended
2021-05-24SenateAmendment(s) offered FA1 Buckingham
2021-05-24SenateRead 2nd time
2021-05-24SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-05-24SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2021-05-22SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-05-22SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2021-05-20SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-05-20SenateReported favorably as substituted
2021-05-18SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-12SenateLeft pending in committee
2021-05-12SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-05-12SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-12SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-04-19SenateReferred to Health & Human Services
2021-04-19SenateRead first time
2021-04-19SenateReceived from the House
2021-04-15HouseReported engrossed
2021-04-15HouseRecord vote RV#227
2021-04-15HousePassed
2021-04-15HouseRead 3rd time
2021-04-14HousePassed to engrossment
2021-04-14HouseRead 2nd time
2021-04-14HousePlaced on Major State Calendar
2021-04-12HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-04-06HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-04-06HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-06HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-03-31HouseReported favorably as substituted
2021-03-31HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-03-31HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-03-31HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-31HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-01HouseReferred to Public Health
2021-03-01HouseRead first time
2021-02-25HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB412 (Same As) 2021-04-08 - Co-author authorized
HB974 (Same As) 2021-03-01 - Referred to Public Health

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB4
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB00004I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB00004H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB00004E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB00004S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB00004F.htm
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB00004S2F1.HTM
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB00004I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB00004H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB00004H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB00004E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB00004E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB00004S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB00004S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB00004F.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB4&RcdVtNo=227&Ch=H&Dt=04/15/2021
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-24-F.PDF#page=67
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB4&RcdVtNo=1615&Ch=H&Dt=05/28/2021

Bill Comments

feedback