TX HB3996 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-27 - Withdrawn from schedule
Pending: House Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-27 - Withdrawn from schedule
Pending: House Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to fees for pipeline construction imposed by certain districts.
Title
Relating to fees for pipeline construction imposed by certain districts.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-27 | House | Withdrawn from schedule |
2021-04-27 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to Natural Resources |
2021-03-29 | House | Read first time |
2021-03-11 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1008 (Same As) 2021-05-25 - Placed on General State Calendar
Subjects
BORDER
GULF OF MEXICO
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Miscellaneous
Utilities
Utilities--Water & Sewer
GULF OF MEXICO
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Miscellaneous
Utilities
Utilities--Water & Sewer